Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cyr, Jessica, Cyr, Timothy, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Morgan, Thomas J Jr, against Edison Insurance Company, represented by Frye, Lateshia Hiatsha, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Timothy Cyr and Jessica Cyr against Edison Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Bay County, Florida and the defendant is an insurance company authorized to write homeowners insurance policies in Florida. The p...
EP - PLTF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 09, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2019EP - COVER LETTER
Date: April 09, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 09, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019019284
Date: April 10, 2019EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DUCES TECUM)
Date: June 27, 2019EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND- DFTS
Date: May 30, 2019EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY BY ATTY. LATESHIA H FRYE
Date: June 14, 2019EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DUCES TECUM) CHAD KING
Date: June 27, 2019EP - PLTF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DFT
Date: April 09, 2019EP - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 14, 2019EP - PLTF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 09, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FOR DEFENDANT
Date: August 22, 2019EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS
Date: July 15, 2019EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLTF
Date: July 16, 2019EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAITIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANT
Date: August 22, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 22, 2019EP - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- PLTFS
Date: August 26, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO TIMOTHY CYR AND JESSICA CYR
Date: August 23, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST ASET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 23, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 26, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 23, 2019EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM 10/08/2019 @ 2:00 P.M. EST
Date: September 09, 2019EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 16, 2019EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS 10/24/2019 @ 10;00 A.M.
Date: October 22, 2019EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 23, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: September 23, 2019EP - EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITHOUT HEARING
Date: November 21, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES WITHOUT HEARING
Date: November 20, 2019EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 08/21/2020 @ 11:00 A.M. EST
Date: July 30, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: October 23, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 24, 2020EP - DEFT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: February 17, 2021EP - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 14, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: December 10, 2020EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 04/27/21 @ 2:00 PM CST
Date: February 23, 2021EP - STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 13, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: October 22, 2021EP - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4476.2340. / 2021081194)
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4476.2340. / 2021081194) | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 04/27/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 04/27/21 @ 2:00 PM CST | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.