Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A 1 Quality Restoration Ii Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Whisler, Joshua, against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Barton, Richard, Barton, Robert Periklis, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 28, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 28, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 28, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 28, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS
Date: March 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO
Date: March 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS CASTLE KEY INS
Date: July 02, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019016758
Date: March 28, 2019EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 12/02/2019 @ 3:00 P.M.
Date: September 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/02/2019 AT 3:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 12/02/19 | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - 12/02/19 @ 3:00PM | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICEOF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 12/02/2019 @ 3:00 P.M. | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DFTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.