Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Soudah, Robert, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Yon, David P, against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company, represented by Zimmern, Benjamin Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Robert Soudah against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company in the Circuit Court for the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. Robert Soudah is a resident of Bay County, Florida, and the insurance policy in que...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 06, 2019EP - SUMMONS TOWER HILL SELECT INS CO
Date: March 06, 2019EP - PLTS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 06, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019011966
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CORPORATE REP FROM TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY 01/10/2020 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF SCHANNON STANLEY 11/26/2019 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CRAIG SNYDER 11/12/2019 @ 1;00 P.M. | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CRAIG SNYDER | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF SCHANNON STANLEY 11/26/2019 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CORPORATE REP FROM TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY 01/10/2020 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CRAIG SNYDER 11/12/2019 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.