Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant In Posession 2, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Keybank Na, Randall, Maria C, Randall, Wayne A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE -PLAINTIFF $76,900.00 | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2017010970 | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.