Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tyndall Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant, Graham, Daphne C, Graham, Joe E, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2016050970 | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE PLT $41,800 | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO BAY COUNTY BULLET | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALES SET FOR 09/19/2016 AT 11:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , JDG: FORECLOSURE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.