Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bank Of America Na, Ventures Trust 2013-I-I-R By Mcm Capital Partners Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bronsing, Paula A, Unknown Spouse Of Paula A Bronsing, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RET UNSERVED | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION - VENTURES TRUST 2013-I-H-R BY MCM CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, IT'S TRUSTEE | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.