Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trustmark National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Smith, Calvin L Jr, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT- REGIONS BANK | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - WRIT OF GARN RETURNED SERVED - REGIONS BANK 07/07/15 | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF MTN FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, NTC TO DFT & WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | GARN,ATTACH,REPLEVIN,DISTRESS ASSESSED $85.00 | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - ISSUED BY CLERK | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - REGIONS BANK | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2015040987 | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2012078770 | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3466.1327 / 2012068798) | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.