Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against North Lagoon Heights Phase Ii Owners Association Inc, Midland Funding Llc, Unknown Tenants, Unknown Spouse Of Susan E Woods, Woods, Susan E, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGE OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT - SUSAN WOODS | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | SURPLUS LETTER SENT TO ALL PARTIES | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COST | |
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.