Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Tenant #3, Tenant #4, Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with ELLINOR, THOMAS ROLAND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2013001737 | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE - $150100 PTF | |
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO NEWS HERALD RE: PUBLICATION | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALES SET FOR 01/09/2013 AT 11:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , JDG: FORECLOSURE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.