Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burnstad, Bryant, against Hernden, Traci, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK $17,050.00 | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT (FAIR DEBT BUYING PRACTICES ACT) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS ====BY FAX====PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 02/11/2021. PARTY SERVED ANTHONY STROH, SPOUSE, CO-RESIDENT ON BEHALF OF TRACI HERNDEN COPIES OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFGERENCE; ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET. THEN MAILED COPIES ON 02/12/2021. BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 08/11/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED BRYANT BURNSTAD (Attorney) on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.