Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Onewest Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Homsey, Greg, against Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Mings, Linda J, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development An Officer Of The United States Of America, Pippin, Frances L, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with MCCLELLAN, HENTZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCLELLAN, HENTZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RET SERVED 04/24/14 | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER SUBMITTED TO JUDGE | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESS | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 04/24/2014 AT 9:45 AM IN JC/ , JDG: MCCLELLAN, HENTZ | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/24/2014 @ 9:45 A.M. | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGE MCCLELLAN, HENTZ: ASSIGNED (TITLE ISSUED) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.