Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Glenn, Alvin Q, filed a(n) Other case against Bay County Board Of Commissioners, Aramark Corporation Inc, Bay County Jail Facility, Anglin, Rick, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with MCCLELLAN, HENTZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCLELLAN, HENTZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2012 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 10/17/2013 AT 9:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: MCCLELLAN, HENTZ | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DFT ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO JUDGE | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING BAY COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, AKA BAY COUNTY, FL'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO JUDGE | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ALVIN GLENN 7/10/12 | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 08/02/2012 AT 9:45 AM IN JC/ , JDG: MCCLELLAN, HENTZ | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DFT ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 08/02/12 @ 9:45 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.