Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against St Joe Timberland Company Of Deleware, Rivercamps On Crooked Creek Community Association Inc, Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property, Thompson, Gregory J, Unknown Spouse Of Gregory J Thompson, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BK | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2011051248 | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2011050467 | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $20,200.00 REGIONS BANK | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED NOTICE OF SALE | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.