Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Craft, Allison J, Craft, James Kenneth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Rosin, John, Fugett, Matthew J Ii, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING RETURNS OF SERVICE ON JAMES KENNETH CRAFT SERVED 7/14/14 AND ALLISON CRAFT SERVED 7/15/14 | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTIONS HEARD AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY NOT OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.