Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Buchanan, Veronica, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Buchanan, James, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2000 |
CategoryChild Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - JAMES BUCHANAN | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - JAMES BUCHANAN | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE - 04/05/2018 AT 1:30 PM | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL HEARING SET FOR 04/05/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN JJE/ , JDG: GARCIA, ANA MARIA | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DIVISION CS ASSIGNED | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGE GARCIA, ANA: ASSIGNED | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGE PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER N: ASSIGNED | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGE CLARK, BRANTLEY S JR: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.