Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reddice, Reneki R, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Levins, Nathan Lee, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2000 |
CategoryChild Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION/DELINQUENT JMT - Recorded (OR.4420.2253. / 2021045648) | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTEMPT^ | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CLK OF CT REQIREMENT/COLL ARREARS/EMANC OF M/CHILD. THE CHILD SUPPORT BALANCE OF $13,556.02 PLUS INTEREST AND FEES AS OF 09/21/17. | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT SET FOR 09/27/2017 AT 8:00 AM IN JJE/ , JDG: SPITZER, GRANT ASHLEY | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DOR - 9/27/17 @ 8:00 AM | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGE GARCIA, ANA MARIA: ASSIGNED | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 3 | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DIVISION CS ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.