Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Pillado, Jose, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Scheff, Samantha Eden, against Citizens Property Insurance Co, represented by Fichtenbaum, Lyndsay D., in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2024 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2024NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 12, 2024ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2024CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 08, 2024ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2024Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time
Date: March 19, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED
Date: February 12, 2024NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 19, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 21 AND A PORTION OF THE WHEREFORE CLAUSE OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.