Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Grace-Fritz, Robin Rudd, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fritz, Russell David, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - REC #202300006383 | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 21, 2023 AT 1:30 PM | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BREWER , SEAN assigned | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 022023DR000216DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2023 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2023004214 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.