Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jacobs, Erin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jacobs, Edgar Jr, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Court - Family scheduled on 12/22/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SEAN BREWER presiding. | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO SUMMONS (EDGAR TIM JACOBS JR) | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing ON DECEMBER 22, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENGAGING COURT REPORTER | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON WIFE'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 022023DR000198DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/24/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.