Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hampton, Bethel Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hampton, John Jr, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FINAL JUDGEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - REC #202300006064 | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONFIDENTIAL INFO/REDACTION OF INFORMATION/RESPONDENT | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONFIDENTIALITY REDACTION | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 07, 2023 AT 11:30 AM VIA ZOOM | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Court - Family scheduled on 9/7/2023 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge SEAN BREWER presiding. | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND FINANCIAL INFO/RESPONDENT | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET HEARING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE TO REVIEW MOTION TO AMEND WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ET AL | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.