Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Freed, Kenneth J., against A1 Autobody And Paint Collision, Inc, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryContract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions117 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time280 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 10/02/09 Not Applicable |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF KENNETH J FREED FILED RE: ACCRUED INTEREST Not Applicable |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 9/24/09 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR JUDGMENT OSC ISSUED |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.