Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Kathy J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hott, Stacy Roanna, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DOR'S PETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 10/26/2020 AT 11:00 AM | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 022020DR000066DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/20/2020 | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of Email | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STACY ROANNA HOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.