Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maldonado, Samuel, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Baker County Sheriff'S Office, Kitchen, Sam, Messer, James, Messer, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with GLORIA WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
|
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- #201900008998
Date: December 20, 2019Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- #201900008998 | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Event Hearing Civil scheduled on 12/19/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 12/19/2019 AT 1:00 PM | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED L T JAMES MESSER 7/12/19 | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SAM KITCHEN | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING BAKER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE TO RESPOND; QUASHING SUMMONS AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO AMEND THE CAPTION | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.