Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Primerica Life Insurance Compa, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rubin, Amy S, against Adams, Aaron M, Adams, Ashley M, Adams, Joel C, Adams, John L, Mcintyre, Joan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Sworn Complaint FOR INTERPLEADER
Date: October 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #201900000796 | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER FOR JOEL ADAMS, AARON ADAMS, ASHLEY ADAMS AND JOHN ADAMS | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF JOAN MCINTYRE | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED- JOAN MCINTYRE- 11/19/2018 SAT 11:40 AM | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PROCESS | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED- JOEL C ADAMS | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED- AARON M ADAMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.