Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green, Odis C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Green, Sarah E, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with STANLEY GRIFFIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTANLEY GRIFFIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Support Refund Ck# 31750 Issued in the amount of $214.82 to FLSDU | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT MODIFIYING CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ON 08/16/2018 AT 2:30 PM | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESERVING COURT REPORTER | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE CORRECTED NOTICE OF RESERVING COURT REPORTER | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Other MEDIATION REPORT | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 5/24/2018 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS presiding. | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:CASE MANAGEMENT set for 5/24/2018 at 1200 PM in MX with Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL ON 05/24/2018 AT 12:00 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.