Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mobley, Scott E, State Farm Florida Insurance C, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Dickie'S Plumbing Inc, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with ROSIER, PHYLLIS M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2010 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSALNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSALNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING STATUS CONF (NOV 22 @ 9:50) | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF CLAIMS | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MORRIS L FOSTER REGISTERED AGENT | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER FOR OUT OF COUNTY PARTIES ON | |
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (DICKIES PLUMBING INC) 20 DAY | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.