Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bosshardt Property Management, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rice, Evelyn, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts Circuit with Kristine Van Vorst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claim $5,001 To $8,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: March 19, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: March 19, 2024STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 519178 Date: 03/21/2024
Date: March 19, 2024STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000)
Date: March 20, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: March 20, 2024SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE
Date: March 20, 2024MOTION (REOPEN)
Date: March 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE) Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE Date: 05/31/2024 Time: 9:30 am Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: ZOOM PLATFORM | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION (REOPEN) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 519178 Date: 03/21/2024 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 519178 Date: 03/21/2024 EVELYN RICE (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.