Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
West Family Chiropractic A A O Sunshine Moss, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Progressive American Insurance Company, represented by Daly Esq, John C, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claim $100.00 Or Less |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This legal document is a complaint filed by West Family Chiropractic on behalf of Sunshine Moss against Progressive American Insurance Company for breach of contract. The complaint alleges that the Defendant denied coverage for medical bills submitte...
TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY MEMO OF DISPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2024TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: December 27, 2023CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE
Date: March 05, 2024TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2023TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 20, 2023TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY SUMMONS 20 DAY CORPORATE SERVICE - UNISSUED
Date: October 02, 2023CERTIFIED COPY OF MIAMI- DADE COUNTY PROGRESS DOCKET
Date: March 05, 2024TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 27, 2023TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 30, 2023TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY SUMMONS 20 DAY CORPORATE SERVICE - ISSUED
Date: October 02, 2023TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING
Date: January 26, 2024TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF MIAMI- DADE COUNTY PROGRESS DOCKET | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR FILE | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTER TRANSFER RECEIVED, CASE NUMBER ASSIGNED (EMAILED TO PARTIES ATTY 3/5/2024 - KBH) Letter - Transfer Received, Case Number Assigned Sent on: 03/05/2024 14:27:20.91 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | FILING FEE FOR STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($100 - $500) Receipt: 518317 Date: 03/05/2024 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE) Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE Date: 04/19/2024 Time: 9:30 am Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: ZOOM PLATFORM | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY LETTER TO PARTIES ADVISING CASE BEING TRANSFERRED TO ALACHUA COUNTY | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY MEMO OF DISPOSITION | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.