Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bw Aviara Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Weisse Esq, David, against Gilliard, Natalie, Gilliard, Renick, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryEviction Delinquent Tenant |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION) Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018
Date: December 31, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION (CLOSES)
Date: January 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED NATALIE GILLIARD | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED RENICK GILLIARD | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED RENICK GILLIARD | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED NATALIE GILLIARD | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 1/18/2019 / CMW | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION (CLOSES) | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 1/14/2019 AS TO: NATALIE GILLIARD & RENICK GILLIARD / CMW | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (NONPAYMENT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.