Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garvin Sr, Hernando L, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against White, Ebony, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2017 |
CategoryPaternity (Non- Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ALERT CANCELLED INDIGENT canceled on: 03/27/2017 For: WHITE, EBONY | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ALERT CANCELLED INDIGENT canceled on: 03/27/2017 For: GARVIN SR, HERNANDO L | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION EBONY WHITE (RESPONDENT); | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - FULL SETTLEMENT | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT EBONY WHITE (RESPONDENT); | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | OATH, ATTEST FEE Receipt: 398389 Date: 03/06/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.