Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hale, G. Gregory filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Adm W/Will |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (REOPEN) | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE (REOPEN) | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.