Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Covington-Brown, Juliana, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Florida Collision Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts with Phillip A. Pena presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip A. Pena Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness $500.01 To $2500.00 |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM (AS TO DEFENDANT'S NAME IN COMMENCEMENT)
Date: November 04, 2013PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT - MEDIATOR ASSIGNED
Date: December 06, 2013RESULTS OF MEDIATION - NO SETTLEMENT SET FOR TRIAL
Date: December 06, 2013MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (IN THE FORM OF AN EMAIL TO JA DATED 02/17/2014) FILED BY PL
Date: February 18, 2014ORDER OF RECUSAL
Date: February 24, 2014MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION
Date: April 03, 2014ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT (CASE REASSIGNED TO HONORABLE PHILLIP A PENA - DIV IV)
Date: February 26, 2014ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)
Date: April 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES) | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FILED | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 04/16/14 @ 3:00 | |
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FILED | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 03/28/14 @ 3:00 PM / PAP | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL 04/16/2014 @ 3:00 PM / PAP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.