Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morrison, Molly M filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts with Toby S. Monaco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeToby S. Monaco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryFormal Adm W/Will |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE (CLOSED) | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF MAILING SPECIFIC DEISE IN LIEU OF RECEIPT | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT - FURMAN WALLACE | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT - SUSANNAH MARLOWE GALAN | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - RACHEL MARLOWE BULLOCK | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - MARY DAY COKER | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.