Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Raychok, Teresa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Crevasse, Carol A, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 05, 2010NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY NO ATTACHMENTS
Date: November 02, 2010MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT
Date: June 22, 2011FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES) - 06/29/11 / VLH
Date: June 30, 2011PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDATS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 15, 2010DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 14, 2010DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 14, 2011DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 10, 2011DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 22, 2011PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 21, 2011NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYNO ATTACHMENTS
Date: March 24, 2011PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 10, 2011NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - FILED BY DEF NO ATTACHMENTS
Date: May 25, 2011JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION (DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) (CLOSES)
Date: June 29, 2011NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - FILED BY DEFNO ATTACHMENTS
Date: February 09, 2011ANSWER AND AFFITMATIVE DEFENSES - FILED BY DEF
Date: September 14, 2010PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 10, 2010REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF - FILED BY DEF
Date: September 14, 2010DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 21, 2011PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 06, 2011DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 31, 2011DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 17, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES) - 06/29/11 / VLH | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED 06/29/11 | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION (DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) (CLOSES) | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - FILED BY DEF NO ATTACHMENTS | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.