Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Myers, Sandra S, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions66 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED LOS ANGELES COUNTY ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 147352 Date: 02/11/2013 |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 146809 Date: 01/28/2013 | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT; DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ON 12/21/12 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF ORDER ADMITTING COPIES INTO EVIDENCE IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE; DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS, BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 11/02/12 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CIVIL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, BY CLERK: TOTAL AMOUNT IS $6,958.98 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA (PLAINTIFF) |
|
October 16, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
October 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 04/29/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3 Result: JUDGMENT - DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.