Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth Ann, against Hawkins, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Limited (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) County of Los Angeles |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment: Issued | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution: Attorney | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) Los Angeles |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.