Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vang, Lisa, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Solis, Mary A., Solis, Jose H., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the March 08, 2012 Minute Order was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California 93724 on 03/09/12 . Parties served: All Parties jy |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 09-MAR-2012 by ZEYANG. |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order Temporary Judge: Ty Kharazi Dismissed in court with prejudice due to stipulated agreement Dept.: 404 Clerk: J. Yang Reporter: 2/46/57 Nature of Hearing: Small Calims Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Lisa Vang Defendant: Jose H. Solis; Mary A. Solis Parties have entered into a stipulated agreement. Defendants paid Plaintiff $700.00 in personal check in full in open court. Plaintiff does not owe Defendants any money on Defendants' Claim. Court advised Defendants to look up Civ. Code, 1950.5 regarding Security Deposits. jy |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 08-MAR-2012 by ZEYANG. |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pursuant CRC1727 temp judge Pursuant to CRC 1727 (sign posted & oral notification given), the parties are deemed to have stipulated to this matter being tried by a temporary judge. jy |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by court Court orders action dismissed with prejudice due to stipulated agreement. jy |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Deft's Claim - Proof Defective Defendant's claim returned to court and filed as to Lisa Vang . Proof of service defective due to Lisa's father signed card Cost $10.00 hf |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$40.00 was made on receipt SCCE56477. |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Claim filed Claim of Defendant filed by Mary A. Solis in the amount of $ 950.00 hf . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.