Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aminabadi, Shirin K., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Freimuth, Keith R., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2011 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of judgment-full Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. Judgment is satisified in full as to Keith R. Freimuth. th. |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment SC Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 08/04/11 to all parties . exd |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 04-AUG-2011 by EDUQUE. |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pursuant CRC1727 temp judge Pursuant to CRC 1727 (sign posted & oral notification given), the parties are deemed to have stipulated to this matter being tried by a temporary judge. exd |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment for plaintiff Court orders judgment entered on 08/02/11. Defendant Keith R. Freimuth shall pay plaintiff Shirin K. Aminabadi $ 5,000.00 and $ 82.50 costs, total judgment $ 5,082.50 on plaintiff's claim. Payable 30 days from the Judgment. exd |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-AUG-2011 by EDUQUE. |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order Temporary Judge: Karen Lynch Dept.: 404 Clerk: E. Duque Reporter/Tape: 11/26/07 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Shirin K. Aminabadi Defendant: np (served) exd |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Keith R. Freimuth and filed. Cost $32.50 hf . |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.