Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lyndow Financial Dba Cosmopolitan Financial, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rodriguez, Ivan A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2011 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ filed wholly satisfied Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. mt |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of execution (SC) issued (Small Claims) Writ of execution issued to the county of Tulare in the amount of $2552.52. cc |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt SCCE68004. |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memo of Cost After Jgm filed Memorandum of Costs After Judgment filed. Costs $0.00, Credit $0.00, Interest $528.40. cc |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 23-JUN-2011 by KARTIS. |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment SC Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 6/23/11 to all parties. kxa |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment for plaintiff Court orders judgment entered on 6/1/11. Defendant, Ivan A. Rodriguez, shall pay plaintiff, Lyndow Financial dba Cosmopolitan Financial $1,884.12 and $115.00 costs, total judgment of $1,999.12 on plaintiff's claim. kxa |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Auth to Appear on Behalf Party Authorization to Appear on behalf of Lyndow Financial filed by Roy Thornhill on 6/1/11. kxa. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Gallagher Dept. 401 Judge: John J. Gallagher Clerk: K. Latt Reporter: 8/54/59 Hearing: Small Claims Court Trial Appearing parties: Roy Thornhill, for plaintiff. Defendant not present. kxa |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.