Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hollowell, Donald Patrick, Sr, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hollowell, Misty Marie, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2011 |
CategoryOut Of State/Foreign Support Registration |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference - Contempt
Judge: Hamilton, Jennifer |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Hamilton, Jennifer |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Commissioner Hamilton Minute Order. See attached. | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Hamilton | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Hamilton, Jennifer |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party served: Misty Marie Hallowell and Donald Patrick Hallowell Sr. Date mailed: 06/02/2020. |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Date mailed: 4/13/20 Served: Misty Marie Hallowell & Donald Patrick Hallowell Sr. |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Order to Show Cause. Party served: Misty Marie Hollowell on 02/10/2020. | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt 04/13/20 at 8am in D302 |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to To FSD clerk's office to process the signed contempt for entry and scanning, conformed copies included. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.