Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Quirarte, Concepcion M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Figueroa, Cesar Vidal, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions418 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date: 07/09/12 Scanned Date: 02/06/13 mn 02/07/13 |
|
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of change of address of Concepcion Quirarte. dc 8/28/12 | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: 2nd floor scanning shelf. Judgment of Dissolution signed 7-9-12. Notice of Entry of Judgment & all other documents sent via mail to each party. 7-9-12 pkv | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. Marital status ends: 7-9-12 7-9-12 pkv | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure of Income and Expense Declaration filed. Served on Cesar Vidal Figueroa by Mail on 3-2-12 . 7-9-12 pkv |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Marital status ends: 7-9-12 7-9-12 pkv |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petitioner's Preliminary 7-9-12 pkv |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution __x_ Legal Separation ___ 7-9-12 pkv Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent to FLEX Judgment documents for processing th/7-6-12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.