Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cabrera, Arlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Torres, Jaime Cabrera, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Duncan, Ronda presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions418 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time208 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date: 07/11/12 Scanned Date: 02/06/13 mn 02/07/13 |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Readiness Motion - Child Support
Judge: Duncan, Ronda |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: scan shelf for judgment dah 8/29/12 | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Order Restore Former Name Former name "Arlene Torres Flores" restored. Original to file - Conformed copy mailed in SASE - jrh 8/7/12 |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent exparte appl for restoration of former name to FLEX. tm 072612 |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. sms-7-11-12 | |
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FL/FS Judgment from Court Marital Status Ends: 7/11/12 sms-7-11-12 |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petitioner's Preliminary & Final tf 051812 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.