Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Courtnay, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Xxxxx, Xxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Skiles, Jon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2011 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Order and Ruling; Motion for Emergency hearing; Emergency petition for Comtempt; and Ruling NISI filed. Served on COURTNAY TURNER by PERS SERV on 12-27-11. jlm 01-05-12 |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause set by ptnr 11CEFL07324 mv12/2/2011 Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Skiles Minute Order from Dept.: 204 Clerk: A. Bitner Reporter: S. Dinuzzo Nature of Hearing: DV/TRO Petitioner Present Pro Per Respondent Present represented by J. Ryan xxxxxxx xxxxx waives notice as to today's hearing. Courtnay Turner is sworn and testifies. xxxxxxx xxxxx is sworn and testifies. The restraining order is denied. ab 122711 |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Calendar for DV prep vr 12/19/11 | |
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Kept File 8Case file kept by department 204 Judge: Skiles ab 121611returned to Clerk's Office. Dept / Judge: |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document sent to sending TRO Request to FLEX for review with file attached. Ptnr is filing another TRO. DV hearing is already set for 12/27/11. ac 12/6/11 |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX for review of TRO request ac 12/6/11 | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence OSC TRO/DV Hrg: 12/27/2011 @ 8:30am Dept. 204 mv12/2/2011 |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona mv12/2/2011 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion mv12/2/2011 Event: App & Decl for Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.