Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Huerta, Yesenia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Villa, Jose Luis Solis, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Skiles, Jon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 29, 2011 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dispo After Hearing by Court JBSIS only CS 11/22/11 |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Skiles Minute Order from Dept.: 204 Clerk: C. Silva Reporter: S. DiNuzzo Nature of Hearing: Trial Petitioner present and sworn appearing in Pro Per Respondent present and sworn appearing with S. Ma Interpreter: Court: L.King Spanish for Petitioner and Respondent Petitioner request restraining order be dismissed. Case is dismissed CS 11/22/11 |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal after hearing DV Case Dismissed after hearing DV CS 11/22/11 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to TRO Hearing: 8/23/11 at 8:30 in D204 dc 8/23/11 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Restraining order after hrg expiration date 11-22-11 sms-9-6-11 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause set by ptnr 11CEFL04669 mv8/1/2011 Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Skiles Minute Order from Dept.: 204 Clerk: C Silva Reporter: J Terry Nature of Hearing: OSC TRO Petitioner Present Respondent Present/Ma Interpreter/Spanish for Petitioner/Respondent Cont to: 11-22-11 at 830 am in dept 204 for Contested Hrg Other: Half Day Trial Existing orders remain in full force and effect. sms-9-6-11 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Answer to TRO filed. Served on Yesenia Huerta by mail on 8/22/11. dc 8/23/11 |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Criminal Protective Order Crinimal Protective Order entered in Case: F11904424, on 8/5/2011. Signed by Judge: Ikeda Protected Party: Yesenia Solis Expires on: 8/5/2012. 8/16/11 rs |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of TRO, Ntc of Hrg, DV 140, DV 105, blk Answer filed. Served on Resp Jose Luis Solis Villa by personal svc on 8/09/11 @ 2:31pm lml 08/10/11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.