Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Benavidez, Monica, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Ortega, Manuel S, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 24, 2011 |
CategoryFamily Law |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1376 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | File returned to Shelf for filing. MM 7.21.11 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date:6.24.11 Scanned Date:7.8.11 MM 7.21.11 |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Custody Order - Juvenile - Final Judgment was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 6/29/2011 to: Monica Benavidez, ADO, Manuel Ortega, PD, FCA, DSS, Nora Carter. aam 6/29/2011 |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:Family Law judgment scanning shelf aam 6/29/2011 | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Juvenile Custody Order Sole legal & physical custody to Mother/Monica Benavidez. Primary residence with Mother aam 6/29/2011 |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.