Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Anderson, Noreen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Debenedetti, Patricia Anne, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Skiles, Jon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2011 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Skiles Minute Order from Dept.: 204 Clerk: C. Silva Reporter: P. Whaley Nature of Hearing: TRO/DV Petitioner Sworn and Present Respondent NOT Present Protected person: Noreen Anderson / Restrained person: Patricia A. DeBenedetti Respondent shall not harass, attack, strike, threaten, assault (sexually or otherwise), hit follow, stalk, molest, destroy personal property, disturb the peace, keep under surveillance, or block movements. Contact (either directly or indirectly), telephone, or send messages, or mail or e-mail. Take any action, directly or through others, to get the addresses or locations of any protected persons or of their family members, caretakers, or guardians. Respondent shall stay at least 100 yards away from the other party and the other party's: Residence; Place of work and vehicle. The person restrained must move out immediately from: 1424 Tarpey Drive Clovis, Ca., The protected person has the right to record communications made by the person restrained that violate the judge's orders. Restraining Order Expires: 07/12/2012 at midnight tf 071211 |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Restraining order after hrg expiration date: 7/12/2012 at midnight tf 071211 |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Restraining Order After hearing was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: 2280 Frseno, Ca. 93721 Fresno, California on 7/12/2011 . Parties served: Patricia A. DeBenedetti tf 071211 |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause Set by Ptnr 11CEFL03702 lml 06/17/11 Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Blk Answer, Description of Abuse, Notice of Court Hearing, Req for Order, TRO filed. Served on respondent by personal services on 6/23/2011. mv6/24/2011 |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence OSC TRO DV Hrg 07/12/11 @ 8:30am in dept 204 lml 06/17/11 |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona lml 06/17/11 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion lml 06/17/11 Event: App & Decl for Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.