Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re the Pet to Decl Minor Free: Lowe
A Family Law case was filed by Lowe, Brandon Charles, against Stanley, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 17, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Family Law
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
General Family
Status
Active
Time To Trial
5 months and 12 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Dallas R Newmann; New atty: Pro Per dc 2/7/14 |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Court reporter fees collected in the amount of $298.00 for trial heard 12/20/11 thru 12/21/11 by Petitioner. dc 5/22/12 | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
App & order for attorney fees Application and order for payment of attorney fees to Amy L Lopez signed by Judge Kimberly Nystrom-Geist filed. lmb 2-23-12 |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Exhibits stored Exhibits logged and stored: Shelf A-2 Box 2. gms |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge's return letter or note Documents returned: Request and Order to Waiver Additional Court Fees Reason: You will need to submit a Request and Order for Waiver of Court Fees before the court can consider your Request to Waive Additional Fees. Judge: Date: 1-26-12 Documents returned to attorney box cb |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Request for Additional Fee Waiver sent to FLEX dc 1/25/12 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Exhibits to Supervisor L Beckett 12-28-11 jmc |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
List filed Witness list filed. 12-28-11 jmc |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Simpson Minute Order from Dept.503 Clerk: T Cohan Reporter: S McKennon Ptnr present, Dallas Neumann Resp present, Amy Lopez Nature of Hearing: Trial MInutes - Day 2 Civil Unlimited Department Pursuant to adjournment of December 21, 2011, Court convenes at 9:19 a.m., with all parties present and ready to proceed. Trisha Wagner-Lowe is sworn and testifies on behalf of the Petitioner at 9:18 a.m. Court takes a break at 9:38 a.m. Court resumes at 10:12 a.m., with all parties present and ready to proceed. Petitioner states he is withdrawing his petition. Petition Dismissed without prejudice. Court adjournes at 10:13 a.m. ~oooOOooo~ 12-28-11 jmc |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit filed 12-28-11 jmc |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Simpson Minute Order from Dept. 503 Clerk: T Cohan Reporter: S McKennon Ptnr present, Dallas Neumann Resp present, Amy Lopez Nature of Hearing: Trial MInutes - Day 1 Civil Unlimited Department Prior to convening, Petitioner's Exhibits #: 1 - 14, Respondent's Exhibits #: A - Y are marked for identification only. The above-entitled action comes on regularly for trial by Court at 11:50 a.m., with the Petitioner being present in court and represented by their counsel, Dallas Neumann, and the Respondent being represented by his counsel, Amy Lopez. Each party announces they are ready to proceed. Court and counsel take up matters of law and procedure as fully stated on the record. Court takes the lunch recess at 11:56 a.m. Court resumes at 1:39 p.m., with all parties present and ready to proceed. Cheryl Scott is sworn and testifies on behalf of the Petitioner at 1:40 p.m. and concludes at 2:07 p.m. Petitioner makes an oral motion to exclude witnesses - Non-party witnesses are excused. Sherry Wagner is sworn and testifies on behalf of the Petitioner at 2:08 p.m. Petitioners Exhibit # 1, 6, 7, having been previously marked for identification are now received into evidence. Sherry Wagner concludes at 2:24 p.m. Court and counsel take up matters of law and procedure as fully stated on the record. Court takes a break at 2:27 p.m. Court reconvenes at 2:46 p.m., with all parties present and ready to proceed. Sonia Moncyo is sworn and testifies on behalf of the Petitioner at 2:47 p.m. and concludes at 3:14 p.m. Court adjourns at 3:14 p.m., until December 21, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in dept. 503. ~oooOOooo~ 12-28-11 jmx |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Trial Brief of Joseph Stanley, Respondent's List of Witnesses filed. Served on Dallas R Neumann by personal service on 12/19/11. dc 12/19/11 |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Documents filed Respondent's Witness List dc 12/19/11 |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filed trial brief Trial Brief of Joseph Stanley Hearing: 12/20/11 at 8:30 am in D201 dc 12/19/11 |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Documents filed Petitioner Brandon Lowe's Request to take Judicial Notice, hearing: 12/20/11 at 8:30 am in D201 dc 12/16/11 |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Ptnr Brandon Lowe's Request to Take Judicial Notice filed. Served on Joe Stanley c/o Amy Lopez by mail on 12/15/11. dc 12/16/11 |
|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of change of address of Amy L Lopez. 12-1-11 jmc | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Case continued by Court to 12-20-11 at 8:30 am in D201 Issues: Trial t/e: 4hrs mmr 11/29/11. Event: Case Continued-Court |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Kept File Case file kept by department 201 after hearing and not returned to Clerk's Office. Trial: 12/20/11 at 8:30 am in D201 mmr 11/29/11 |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Temp Judge Minute Order from Dept.: 201 Temporary Judge: Robert Cassion/Judge: A. Corona Clerk: M. Rodriguez Reporter: S. Applegate Nature of Hearing: Trial Ptnr: Present/Sworn w/counsel Dallas Neumann Resp: Present/Sworn w/counsel Amy Lopez Continued to 12-20-11 at 8:30 am in D201 Issues: Trial t/e 4hrs Matter was trailed to 1:30 p.m. to be heard by Judge Corona. Case is recalled. OSC to relieve counsel, Amy Lopez is denied as fully stated on the record. The Court finds good cause for continuance. The Court continues the trial. The Court will reserve sanctions in form of restitution of travel expense, and preparation of trial. FCS was notified of the continuance date and the mediator is present that day. mmr 11/29/11 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of Notice of Ex-Parte Hearing on 11/29/11 at 8:30 am in D201 filed. dc 11/28/11 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
List filed Petitioner Brandon Lowe's Witness List th/11-28-11 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Trial brief filed sms-11-28-11 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Service of Petitioner Exhibit and Witness List Served on Joe Stanley c/o Amy Lopez by mail on 11-23-11 th/11-28-11 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
List filed Petitioner Brandon Lowe's Exhibit List th/11-28-11 |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion OSC: to be relieved as counsel w/order shortening time granted per Judge AMC Hrg: 11/29/2011 @ 8:30am D-201 aam 11/23/2011 Event: OSC other no fees |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent Exparte/OSC request to be relieved as counsel to FLEX Attn Cindy Bradshaw for review lml 11/22/11 |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty:Pro-per New atty: Dallas R Neumann tm 092711 |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: C. Bradshaw mmr 9/27/11 | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Case continued by Court to 11/29/11 Issues Trial. . Parties confirmed trial that was currently set on 11/29/11 mmr 9/27/11 Event: Case Continued-Court |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed Amended Termination Report filed. 9-23-11 cb |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Dept 201 hrg 9-26-11 at 1:30 cl 8-30-11 | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judge's return letter or note Documents returned: Notice of Limited Scope Representation and Substitution of Attorneys Reason: Ms. Lowe is not the petitioner in this case Judge: Date: 8-30-11 returned to attorney's box |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion matter continued to 9-26-11 at 1:30 p.m. re: seco matter also continued to 11-29-11 at 8:30 a.m. re; Trial (4 hrs) cl 8-30-11 Event: Case Continued-Court |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Corona Minute Order from Dept.: 201 at 1:30 p.m. Clerk: C. Lugo Reporter: S. Applegate Nature of Hearing: Appointment of Counsel continued to 9-29-11 at 1:30 p.m. Dept. 201 re: seco Attorney Amy Lopez appears to accept appointment of counsel. The court finds the respondent is unable to pay for his own attorney. The court will appoint Amy Lopez she will be paid at county rate. The father Joe Angelo Stanley will be interviewed by Cheryl Scott on 9-13-11 at 11am. Trial date set on 11-29-11 at 8:30 a.m. for a 4 hour trial assigned out to master calendar. cl 8-30-11 |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration 8-24-11 cb |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Showing Service of the Income and Expense Declaration on Petitioner on 8-16-11 8-24-11 cb |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned documents letter Documents returned: POSBM and IED Reason: POSBM is defective: 4a, e,d. 5-no date and server is involved in the case Date: 08-08-11 jlm 08-10-11 |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion matter continued to 8-29-11 at 1:30 p.m. Dept 201 re: appointment cl 8-4-11 Event: Case Continued-Court |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Dept 201 hrg 8-29-11 cl 8-4-11 | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Adoption
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Corona Minute Order from Dept.: 201 Clerk: C. Lugo Reporter: P. Whaley Nature of Hearing: Termination Ptnr/Present/Sworn/Pro Per Resp/Present/sworn/Pro per The court will continue this matter to 8-29-11 at 1:30 p.m. Dept 201 re: appointment of counsel. The court will order the respondent Joe Stanley to file and serve an Income and Expense decl. prior to the next court date. The court has found that the respondent is unable to hire private counsel, so at this time the court will appoint counsel for the respondent, he/she will be paid at the county rate. cl 8-4-11 |
|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Adoption Report - FCS Termination Report 7-29-11 cb |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: C. Bradshaw mmr 7/1/11 | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Petn to Declare Minor Free from Parental custody and control citation to appear filed. Served on Joe Stanley by pers on 6/25/11. ms 6/30/11 |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Status Review
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Corona Minute Order from Dept.: 201 Clerk: M. Rodriguez Reporter: S. Applegate Nature of Hearing: Case Status Review The Court calls case number 11CEFL03683 in the matter of the petition to declare Joey Angelo Stanley, Jr. free from the custody and control of the presumed father, Joe Stanley. The petitioner, Brandon Lowe, is in pro per. Pursuant to Local Family Law Rule 5.9.1 through 5.9.2 the following documents must be forwarded to Family Court Services no later than 15 calendar days from the receipt of notification by Family Court Services: 1. Birth Certificate of the Child (Certified Copy); 2. Birth Certificate of Natural Parent retaining custody of the child; 3. Birth Certificate of the adopting party; 4. Marriage Certificate of Natural Parents (Certified Copy) (if applicable); 5. Marriage Certificate of Natural Parent and Stepparent (Certified Copy) (if applicable); 6. Final Judgment of Dissolution of Natural Parents (Filed Copy) (if applicable); 7. Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage of the Adopting Parent (Filed Copy) (if applicable); 8. Any Child Support, Custody or Visitation Orders; 9. Any Name Change Orders; 10. Social History Data Sheet. In the event that Family Court Services is not provided with the requested documents, no appointment will be scheduled and the court will be notified that Family Court Services cannot proceed with the Stepparent adoption. In view of today's hearing the Court will enter the following order: The Court will allow for this matter to proceed for the Citation Hearing in Department 201 at 1:30 p.m. on August 2, 2011. IT IS SO ORDERED mmr 7/1/11 |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 17-JUN-2011 by CBRADSHAW. |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Citation Issued - Hrg. 8-2-11 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept. 201 Case Status Review Hrg. - 6-28-11 at 1:30 p.m. in Dept. 201 6-17-11 cb Event: Pet Termination Par Rights |