Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vinton, Christine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Glenda Allen-Hill presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | File returned to shelf. MM 9.21.11 | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date:7.26.11 Scanned Date:9.14.11 MM 9.21.11 |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:2nd floor scanning shelf bzj 072711 | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _x__ Legal Separation ___ bzj 072711 Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Preliminary bzj 072711 |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | file forwarded to B. Jones, SHC Family Law, 1st flr for entry of Judgment. 7/26/11 cv | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Judgment signed 7/26/11. Notice of Entry of Judgment & all other documents sent via mail to each party. 7/26/11 cv |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. Marital status ends 12-13-11 bzj 072711 | |
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg bzj 072711 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.