Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Elena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Ruben Salas, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Service of Response Served on William Frank by mail on 7-19-12 |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Rsp Pet Disso Marr-no children th/7-19-12 |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE185605. |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: PRO PER New atty: WILLIAM R FRANK jlm 07-13-12 |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dispo After Hearing by Court jbsis only cl 7-19-11 |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Readiness OSC - Modification of Spousal Support set by ptnr 11CEFL03265 mv6/8/2011 Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Corona Minute Order from Dept.: 201 at 9am Clerk: C. Lugo Reporter: D. Bedrosian Nature of Hearing: OSC ss Ptnr/Present/Pro Per Resp/Present/Pro Per Off calendar. Per the request of both parties matter is off calendar. The parties have reconciled. cl 7-19-11 |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Service of OSC, Appl for order and Supp Decl, Decl of petitioner, Completed I & E Decl,Blk Resp Decl and I & E Decl Served on ruben Martinez by personal service on 6-14-11 th/6-17-11 |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration filed. mv6/8/2011 |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration mv6/8/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.