Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moncrief, Eva, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Moncrief, Justin R, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions229 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FL Calendar for Companion to Temp Orders case #13CEFL00726 (rjc/flex 09/10/2013) | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX ac 9/9/13 | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:FLEX for review of Ex Parte CCCC case to 13-00726 ac 7/8/13 | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: OSC DESK (rjc/flex 2/7/2013) | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX as companion to 13CEFL00726. mv2/6/2013 | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Order terminating Family Law Restraining Order issued on 5/19/11 . ryk 12/21/11 Event: Order terminating |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Allen-Hill Minute Order from Dept.: 203 at 8:30 Clerk: R. Kim Reporter: G. Gregory Nature of Hearing: OSC Ptnr: Present/Pro Per Resp: Present/Pro Per Ms. Moncrief's request to withdraw the restraining orders issued on 5/19/11 is granted. Restraining orders issued on 5/19/11 is terminated. Parties stipulates to terminate the custody orders. Case is dismissed. ryk 12/21/11 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal after hearing DV Case Dismissed after hearing DV ryk 12/21/11 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre Set by Ptnr 11CEFL02625 lml 04/29/11 Judge: Allen-Hill, Glenda |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of removal of restraining order filed. Served on Justin Moncrief by personal service on 111711. tm 111811 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.